This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:50:36 (UTC).

Duhaney v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Duhaney filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60130

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Everoy Duhaney

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 Se 6Th St., 17Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Marshall Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

John Michael Marees, II

Attorney at Messer Strickler, LTD.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacskonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be Stayed pending Issuance of the Eleventh Circuit's decision. Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing Case: granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit. Staying Case; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing Case: granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit. Staying Case; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending En Banc Review by the Eleventh Circuit in Hunstein v. Preferred Collection & Management Services, Inc. by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be Stayed pending Issuance of the Eleventh Circuit's decision. Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 1/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Everoy Duhaney v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15324230, filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. No Answer Filed/ No Motion to Dismiss Filed in State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnette, Lauren) Text Modified on 1/18/2022 (mab). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Michael Marees, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren M. Burnette