This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

DUFFY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 DUFFY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and JON D. LEVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOYCE DUFFY

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S. BISCHOFF

Attorney at ROACH HEWITT RUPRECHT SANCHEZ & BISCHOFF, P.C.

66 Pearl Street, Suite 200

Portland, ME 04101

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY

Attorney at MARDEN, DUBORD, BERNIER & STEVENS

44 Elm Street, P.O. Box 708

Waterville, ME 04903

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/17/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

9 #7

Exhibit G-DRM Affidavit

9 #6

Exhibit F-Notice of Removal

9 #5

Exhibit E-Standard Scheduling Order

9 #3

Exhibit C-Complaint and Summons

9 #2

Exhibit B-Civil Summary Sheet

9 #1

Exhibit A-Entry of Appearance

#9

(#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Entry of Appearance, #2 Exhibit B-Civil Summary Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Standard Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit F-Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G-DRM Affidavit)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Record by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP Responses due by 6/5/2019. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change event type to motion to extend time (lrc). (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#4

(#4) **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to reflect that this filing was made in error and will be re-filed by counsel (lrc). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/15/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #3

answer

1 #2

summons

1 #1

complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-11. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) Fee due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 answer)(bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/17/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Entry of Appearance, #2 Exhibit B-Civil Summary Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Standard Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit F-Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G-DRM Affidavit)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Reset Deadlines : State Court Record due by 5/24/2019. (akr) Modified on 5/17/2019 to correct date filed(akr). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Record. Time is extended to May 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Record by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP Responses due by 6/5/2019. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change event type to motion to extend time (lrc). (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (lrc) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to reflect that this filing was made in error and will be re-filed by counsel (lrc). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2017372.), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/15/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-11. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) Fee due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 answer)(bfa) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less