This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 09:58:16 (UTC).

Duffek v. iMedia Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Duffek filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against iMedia Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01413

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Duffek

Defendant

iMedia Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bert Black

Lauren Allison D'Cruz

Makenzie L. Krause

Defendant Attorneys

James Hermon

Kristina Kaluza

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Consent Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK) Modified text on 7/29/2021 (MSK). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Hermon for iMedia Brands, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/23/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. Hermon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8827892 filed by iMedia Brands, Inc.. (Kaluza, Kristina) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to iMedia Brands, Inc. (CLK) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-1413 ECT/BRT. (CLK) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against iMedia Brands, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8821110) filed by Laura Duffek. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Black, Bert) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED AT #2 . COMPLAINT against iMedia Brands, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8821034) filed by Laura Duffek. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Black, Bert) Modified text on 6/16/2021 (CLK). (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less