This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 08:50:04 (UTC).

Duex v. Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC d/b/a Sahara Las Vegas

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Duex filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC d/b/a Sahara Las Vegas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02073

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Z. Duex

Defendant

Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC doing business as Sahara Las Vegas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Randazza

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Ronald D Green, Jr

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Alex J. Shepard

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorney

Susan H. Hilden

Attorney at Meruelo Group LLC

2500 East Second Street

Reno, NV 89505

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/17/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The ENE will be held remotely by video, with further instructions to be provided at a later date regarding the logistics for appearances. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted by email to njk_chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than 3:00 PM on 2/10/2021. Hard copies of the evaluation statements will not be accepted. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hilden, Susan) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/21/2021.(Hilden, Susan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Z. Duex. Las Vegas Resort Holdings, LLC served on 11/16/2020. (Randazza, Marc) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sonya Z. Duex. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Randazza, Marc) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (HAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sonya Zoe Duex (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6252610) by Sonya Zoe Duex. Proof of service due by 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Randazza, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less