This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:36:28 (UTC).

Dubon Miranda et al v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Dubon Miranda filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01110

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jose de la Cruz Espinoza

Marvin Dubon Miranda

Ajibade Thompson Adegoke

Defendants

Donna Bounds

William V. Delauter

William P. Barr

Matthew T. Albence

CHAD F. WOLF

Janean Ohin

James McHenry

Jack Kavanagh

William Delauter

Amicus Curiae

Equal Justice Under Law

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Taichi Steiner

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland

3600 Clipper Mill Road, Suite 350

Baltimore, MD 21211

Claudia R. Cubas

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants Rights (CAIR) Coalition

1612 K Street Nw, Suite 204

Washington, DC 20006

Michael K.T. Tan

Attorney at ACLU Immigrants' Rights Project

125 Broad St, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Jenny Kim

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition

1612 K St. Nw Ste. 204

Washington, DC 20006

Saba Bireda

Attorney at Sanford Heisler Sharp LLP

700 Pennsylvania Ave. Se Ste. 300

Washington, DC 20003

Melody Vidmar

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition

1612 K St. Nw Ste. 204

Washington, DC 20006

Sonia Kumar

Attorney at ACLU of Maryland

3600 Clipper Mill Road, Suite 350

Baltimore, MD 21211

Adina B Appelbaum

Attorney at Capital Area Immigrants' Rights (CAIR) Coalition

1612 K St. Nw Ste. 204

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Susan M Imerman

Attorney at United States Department Of Justice

450 Fifth St. Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Evelyn Lombardo Cusson

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, District of Maryland

36 South Charles Street, Fourth Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Phil Telfeyan

Attorney at Equal Justice Under Law, Inc.

601 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., South Building-Suite 900

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#32

RESTRICTED

#31

RESTRICTED

#30

#29

#27

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Status Report Submitted Joint Status Report by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Donna Bounds, William Delauter, Equal Justice Under Law, Jack Kavanagh, James McHenry, Janean Ohin, Chad F. Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Imerman, Susan) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Imerman on behalf of All Defendants (Imerman, Susan) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Filing BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE EQUAL JUSTICE UNDER LAW by Equal Justice Under Law. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply re #23 MOTION to Certify Class ; setting deadline Defendants shall respond to the Complaint and Petition for Writ of Habeas. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/8/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Marginal ORDER approving #24 Motion for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE EQUAL JUSTICE UNDER LAW. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/8/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Certify Class , #1 Complaint,,,, by Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Donna Bounds, William Delauter, Jack Kavanagh, James McHenry, Janean Ohin, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cusson, Evelyn) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Granting #15 Motion for TRO, construed as a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/29/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bireda, Saba) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/29/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Equal Justice Under Law by Equal Justice Under Law (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief of Amicus Curiae Equal Justice Under Law)(Telfeyan, Phil) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jenny Kim. Directing attorney Jenny Kim to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael K.T. Tan. Directing attorney Michael K.T. Tan to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued 60 days as to Matthew T. Albence, William P. Barr, Donna Bounds, William Delauter, Jack Kavanagh, James McHenry, Janean Ohin, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Saba Bireda (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8633920.) by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adina Appelbaum (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8633911.) by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melody Vidmar (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8633890.) by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jenny Kim (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8633879.) by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael K.T. Tan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8633843.) by Marvin Dubon Miranda, Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8633631.), filed by Ajibade Thompson Adegoke, Marvin Dubon Miranda, Jose de la Cruz Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Melody Vidmar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Civil Cover Sheet, #29 Summons William P. Barr, #30 Summons Chad F. Wolf, #31 Summons Matthew T. Albence, #32 Summons James McHenry, #33 Summons Janean A. Ohin, #34 Summons William Delauter, #35 Summons Jack Kavanagh, #36 Summons Donna Bounds, #37 Summons USAO District of Maryland)(Steiner, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phil Telfeyan