This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:49:14 (UTC).

DuBois v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 DuBois filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Fifth Third Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Noelle C. Collins and Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00712

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Noelle C. Collins

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew DuBois

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Fifth Third Bank, N.A.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin M Baxter

Attorney at BAXTER AND BAXTER LLP

8835 Sw Canyon Lane, Suite 130

Portland, OR 97225

Matthew P. Cook

2885 Sanford Ave Sw #42270

Grandville, MI 49418

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Lyons

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP - New York

620 Eighth Avenue, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10018-1405

Michael Warner Kopp

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP - Sacramento

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2350

Sacramento, CA 95814-4428

Kevin T. Bennett

Attorney at SCHUCKIT AND ASSOCIATES PC - Zionsville

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Robert J. Schuckit

Attorney at SCHUCKIT AND ASSOCIATES PC - Zionsville

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Jared Brown

Attorney at SCHUCKIT AND ASSOCIATES PC - Zionsville

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Kara A. Czanik

Attorney at DINSMORE AND SHOHL LLP - Cincinnati

255 E. Fifth Street, 1900 Chemed Center

Cincinnati, OH 45202-3172

David M. Mangian

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Ashton K. Dietrich

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Angela M. Taylor

Attorney at JONES DAY - Irvine

3161 Michelson Dr., Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

J. Todd Applegate

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - Edwardsville

101 W. Vandalia, Suite 300

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

51 #1

Text of Proposed Order

51 #51

Main Document

#50

(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew DuBois against Fifth Third (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#48

(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew DuBois against Equifax (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

45 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel - Kevin T. Bennett , Trans

45 #45

Main Document

#44

(#44) VACATED - ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within one hundred eighty (180) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 7/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/16/2022. (KRZ) Modified on 2/17/2022 (KRZ). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Settlement with Fifth Third by Matthew DuBois (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

#3

2 #1

Attachment Notice of Removal

#2

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Process, Pleadings, Orders - State Court Case

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#52) Docket Text ORDER: STIPULATION With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. ; SO ORDERED, Trans Union, LLC terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/15/2022. (KRZ) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) STIPULATION With Prejudice Between Plaintiff And Defendant Trans Union, LLC Only by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Jared) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew DuBois against Fifth Third (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Notice of Dismissal Against Equifax #48 is SO ORDERED. Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 3/1/2022. (KEK) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew DuBois against Equifax (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #45 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel Kevin T. Bennett for Trans Union by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel - Kevin T. Bennett, Trans Union)(Bennett, Kevin); GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/23/2022. (KRZ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Order #44 is VACATED. Defendant Fifth Third is termed pursuant to their Notice of Settlement #43 . Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/17/2022. (KRZ) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION to Withdraw Counsel Kevin T. Bennett for Trans Union by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel - Kevin T. Bennett, Trans Union)(Bennett, Kevin) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) VACATED - ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file within one hundred eighty (180) days from the date of this Order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 7/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 02/16/2022. (KRZ) Modified on 2/17/2022 (KRZ). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Settlement with Fifth Third by Matthew DuBois (Cook, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent to Removal by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Schuckit, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (KCD) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JKL) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Ashton K. Dietrich for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Dietrich, Ashton) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Matthew DuBois.(JKL) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Mangian for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. Parent companies: Fifth Third Bancorp, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Fifth Third Bancorp,. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 21SL-CC02371, with receipt number AMOEDC-8707760, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Fifth Third Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Process, Pleadings, Orders - State Court Case, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth Third Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant