This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:18:49 (UTC).

Duarte v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Duarte against Davis-Director TDCJ-CID in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03218

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Ewing Werlein, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Omar Duarte

Respondent

Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #3

Cover Letter

1 #1

Continuation

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Omar Duarte. [Copy of petition mailed to Petitioner per cover letter request] (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover Letter)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Brodbeck on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Brodbeck, Lori) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO ANSWER. Respondent shall file an answer within 60 days of the date of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Supplemental Brief, "Brandy Material" by Omar Duarte, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Brodbeck on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Brodbeck, Lori) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Supplemental Brief, "Brandy Material" by Omar Duarte, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO ANSWER. Respondent shall file an answer within 60 days of the date of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Confirmation of receipt of payment from Elizabeth Ocampo in the amount of $5.00 for Omar Duarte re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt date: 8/27/2019. Receipt number BRO007736. Purpose Description: Initial Filing Fee. (mperez, 1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Omar Duarte. [Copy of petition mailed to Petitioner per cover letter request] (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Envelope, #3 Cover Letter)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.