This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:22:37 (UTC).

Duart v. Mici et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Duart filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Mici. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12489

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter Duart

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Chrisopher Fladger

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Richard Felt

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Joseph C. Boeggeman

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Kenneth R Stone

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Derek Gaughan

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Gary Alvarado

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Thomas McMahon

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Muhammad Mahdi

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Cortney Paul Lynch

Bridgewater, MA 02324

John Beyers

Bridgewater, MA 02324

Defendants

Carol Mici

Lisa Mitchell

 

Court Documents

#36

35 #1

cover letter

#35

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Declaration

#21

#18

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Mail sent to Joseph C. Boeggman re #22 Order : Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Substitute Party (and request for new summons to be issued) by Peter Duart. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The separate motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis of plaintiffs Beyers 25 , Felt 26 , Boeggeman 27 , Stone 28 , Fladger 29 , Alvarado 30 , McMahon 31 , Lynch 32 , and Mahdi 33 are GRANTED. The directive in the Court's January 30, 2020 order #22 to file a renewed in forma pauperis motion may be disregarded by these nine plaintiffs. The Court has not received a renewed in forma pauperis motion from plaintiff Gaughan. Plaintiff Gaughan must file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a six-month institutional account statement by February 20, 2020. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE to Plaintiff and Local Rule 4.1(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered denying #4 Motion for leave to serve by certified mail ; denying without prejudice 17 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #18 Motion to Amend; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The official capacity claims for damages are DISMISSED. The complaint shall be construed as asserting (1) individual capacity claims for damages; (2) individual and official capacity claims for injunctive relief. The Clerk shall issue summonses for both defendants. Duart is responsible for ensuring that (a) these defendants are served with a summons, the complaint, and this order; and (b) said service is executed in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The aforesaid service must be completed within 90 days of the issuance of the summonses. Because Duart is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Verification of Complaint filed by Peter Duart. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter/request (non-motion) from Peter Duart requesting summonses. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#19) DOCKET SHEET sent to Peter Duart (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Peter Duart.(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Thomas McMahon by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth T. Stone by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Muhammad Mahdi by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Courtney Paul Lynch by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Derek J Gaughan by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) Modified on 12/16/2019 (Castilla, Francis). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of John Beyers by Peter Duart. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to serve the defendants via certified mail return receipt by Peter Duart.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Peter Duart.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Duart. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AO 240 Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Supplement Inmate Statement)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Peter Duart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less