Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2021 at 22:39:19 (UTC).

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. et al v. HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton, Leda D. Wettre and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-15285

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judges

Leda D. Wettre

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC. doing business as MEDLINK

SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. doing business as SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN MILUN

Attorney at THE KILLIAN FIRM PC

555 Route 1 South, Suite 430

Iselin, NJ 08830

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL

Attorney at BECKER LLC

354 Eisenhower Parkway, Suite 1500

Livingston, NJ 07039

 

Court Documents

18 #3

Certificate of Service

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order

18 #1

Brief

#18

(#18) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to answer or otherwise respond to second amended complaint through 4/15/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/23/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION re #15 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint by HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#15

(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC., SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC..(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Brief

6 #6

Certificate of Service

6 #4

Text of Proposed Order

6 #3

Certification

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.. HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.. HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT For Recovery of Benefits Under ERISA and for Breach of Contract against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC., SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC..(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11588248), filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. D/B/A SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC. D/B/A MEDLINK, SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to the case. (smf, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to answer or otherwise respond to second amended complaint through 4/15/2021, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/23/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION re #15 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint by HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC., SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC..(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER withdrawing #9 MOTION to Dismiss and allowing plaintiffs until 3/23/2021 to amend complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/4/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter from plaintiff's attorney on behalf of both parties re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter requesting further adjournment of the #9 motion date to 4/5/2021, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/24/2021. (lag, ) Modified on 2/24/2021 (lag, ). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter from Michael E. Holzapfel, Esq. dated February 19, 2021 to the Honorable Susan Wigenton Requesting Adjournment of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER admitting Lisa S. Kantor and Timothy J. Rozelle pro hac vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/20/2021. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL on behalf of HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (HOLZAPFEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.. HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.. HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT For Recovery of Benefits Under ERISA and for Breach of Contract against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC., SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC..(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HORIZON BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY, HORIZON HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11588248), filed by SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC. D/B/A SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, MEDICAL CONCIERGE, INC. D/B/A MEDLINK, SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILUN, RYAN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. dba Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medical Concierge, Inc. is a litigant