This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 21:49:29 (UTC).

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. et al v. Centene Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Centene Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer, Pedro V. Castillo and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04112

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

Presiding Judges

Dale S. Fischer

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation

ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation

SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation

SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation

SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation

SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.

Defendants

CENTENE CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a California corporation

ILEANA HERNANDEZ

MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC., a Delaware corporation

LIANN GOHARI

OPTUM SERVICES, INC., a Delaware corporation

KENNETH B. JULIAN

MICHAEL NEIDORFF

JOHN M. LEBLANC

Centene Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa S. Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Sander Dawson

Attorney at Dawson and Rosenthal

402 West Broadway Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Timothy J Rozelle

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Steven C. Dawson

Attorney at Dawson and Rosenthal PC

25 Schnebly Hill Road

Sedona, AZ 86336

Anita Rosenthal

Attorney at Dawson and Rosenthal PC

25 Schnebly Hill Road

Sedona, AZ 86336

Defendant Attorneys

Alan Jay Weil

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2513

Nary Kim

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven M Cady

Attorney at Williams and Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Brian P Maschler

Attorney at Gordon and Rees

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gregory E Robinson

Attorney at Robinson and Robinson LLP

2301 Dupont Drive Suite 530

Irvine, CA 92612

Charles Russell Patterson

Attorney at Robinson and Robinson LLP

2301 Dupont Drive Suite 530

Irvine, CA 92612

A. Louis Dorny

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jordan S. Altura

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael J Wright

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#92

#89

#88

#87

#86

#47

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #91 filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Cady, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss) (Cady, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Optum Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint) (Wright, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #47 , filed by Plaintiffs Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.(Dawson, Sander) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) MINUTE ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court GRANTS the motions to dismiss #51 , #56 WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Plaintiffs wish to file an amended complaint, they must do so by 5/28/2021. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo re Stipulation for Protective Order #86 . (see document for details) (hr) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant Optum Services, Inc..(Wright, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#85) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court VACATES the scheduling conference set for March 5 at 8:30 a.m. The Court will re-schedule the conference if there is a need to do so. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On 2/25/2021, the Clerk's office issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #81 , in re the NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J. Wright on behalf of Defendant Optum Services, Inc #80 . The Court accepts the document as filed. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 20 days, filed by Plaintiffs Adeona Healthcare, Inc., Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Satya Health of California, Inc., Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc., Shreya Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Florida, Inc., Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc., Sovereign Health of Texas, Inc.., Vedanta Laboratories, Inc... (Kantor, Lisa) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Notice of Related Case filed by Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff. (Craig, Christopher) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Anita Rosenthal. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Dawson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Centene Corporation, Liann Gohari, Health Net Life Insurance Company, Ileana Hernandez, Kenneth B. Julian, John M. Leblanc, Managed Health Network, Inc., Michael Neidorff, Optum Services, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, (Kantor, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Kantor, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Kantor, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 05/05/2020, receipt number 26339743), filed by Plaintiffs SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation, SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation, ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation, VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation, SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation, SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SHREYA HEALTH OF ARIZONA, INC., an Arizona corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF PHOENIX, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN HEALTH OF TEXAS, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa S. Kantor added to party VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla))(Kantor, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF FLORIDA, INC., a Florida corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ADEONA HEALTHCARE, INC., a California corporation is a litigant