This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2021 at 07:17:06 (UTC).

Du et al v. DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2021 Du filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DJ KITCHEN LLC dba DJ KITCHEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02847

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xiaoying Luo

Yong Du

Defendants

Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao

A Ming

DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN

Joe Chen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIAN HANG

Attorney at HANG & ASSOCIATES PLLC

136-18 39Th Avenue Suite 1003

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao by Personal Service. Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon Joe Chen by Personal Service. Joe Chen served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN by Personal Service. DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon A Ming by Personal Service. A Ming served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Designation Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15216215.), filed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao by Personal Service. Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon Joe Chen by Personal Service. Joe Chen served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN by Personal Service. DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo re: Francis Nicholas DiMeo III served Summons and Complaint upon A Ming by Personal Service. A Ming served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to A Ming, DJ KITCHEN LLC. dba DJ KITCHEN, Joe Chen, Nan Zhao aka Lan Zhao. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/28/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15216215.), filed by Yong Du, Xiaoying Luo. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HANG, JIAN) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jian Hang