This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 08:00:54 (UTC).

D.T. v. San Diego Metropolitan Transit System et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 D T filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against San Diego Metropolitan Transit System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00901

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.T.

Defendants

Officer J. Torres

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

San Diego Metropolitan Transit System

City of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter L. Carr

Attorney at Sias | Carr, LLP

3756 Santa Rosalia Drive, Suite 326

Los Angeles, CA 90008

Defendant Attorneys

Roger P Bingham

Attorney at Wheatley Bingham & Baker LLP

1201 Camino Del Mar Ste 201

Del Mar, CA 92014

Dave Esteves Abad

Attorney at City of San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1620

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Proof of Service

3 #2

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Dismiss : Any opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before June 26, 2019. Any reply is due on or before July 3, 2019. A hearing for the motion is set for October 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/11/19.(dlg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

4 #1

Proof of Service

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of San Diego, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12485070.), filed by D.T..The new case number is 3:19-cv-00901-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Carr, Peter)(mme) (jao). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of No Filing of Any Opposition to Defendant City of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss by City of San Diego re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave) (jrm). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

3 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bingham, Roger)Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party Officer J. Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party San Diego Metropolitan Transit System(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 06/09/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave)Attorney Dave Esteves Abad added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of No Filing of Any Opposition to Defendant City of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss by City of San Diego re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave) (jrm). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Dismiss : Any opposition to the motion shall be filed on or before June 26, 2019. Any reply is due on or before July 3, 2019. A hearing for the motion is set for October 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/11/19.(dlg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bingham, Roger)Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party Officer J. Torres(pty:dft), Attorney Roger P Bingham added to party San Diego Metropolitan Transit System(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 06/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Abad, Dave)Attorney Dave Esteves Abad added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of San Diego, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, Officer J. Torres, San Diego Metropolitan Transit System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12485070.), filed by D.T..The new case number is 3:19-cv-00901-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Carr, Peter)(mme) (jao). (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.