This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2020 at 08:50:11 (UTC).

Drewniak v. US Customs and Border Protection et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Drewniak filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against US Customs and Border Protection. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00852

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Drewniak

Defendants

Jeremy Forkey

Mark A. Qualter

Robert N. Garcia

US Customs and Border Protection

US Border Patrol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry Klementowicz

SangYeob Kim

Mark L. Sisti

Gilles R. Bissonnette

Emma Bond

Steven J. Dutton

Jeremy T. Walker

Scott H. Harris

Lia Ernst

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Exhibit B -- Service as to Individual Defendants

16 #1

Exhibit A -- Service as to US Defendants

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

1 #8

Summons - Waiver Garcia

1 #7

Summons - Waiver Forkey

1 #6

Summons - Waiver Qualter

1 #5

Summons - Waiver Border Patrol

1 #4

Summons - Waiver CBP

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B -- Circuit Court 8.22.18 Motion for Reconsideration Order

1 #1

Exhibit A - Circuit Court 5.1.18 Order

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint as to Jeremy Forkey, Robert N. Garcia, Mark A. Qualter, US Border Patrol, US Customs and Border Protection filed by Jesse Drewniak. Served/Mailed on 9/11/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Service as to US Defendants, #2 Exhibit B -- Service as to Individual Defendants)(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 20-cv-852-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(ko) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr recused. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lia Ernst on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Lia Ernst added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Ernst, Lia) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H. Harris on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Scott H. Harris added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Harris, Scott) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Dutton on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Steven J. Dutton added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Dutton, Steven) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy T. Walker on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Jeremy T. Walker added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Walker, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emma Bond on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Emma Bond added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Bond, Emma) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summonses issued electronically as to Jeremy Forkey, Robert N. Garcia, Mark A. Qualter, US Border Patrol, US Customs and Border Protection. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (ed) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark L. Sisti on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Mark L. Sisti added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Sisti, Mark) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-852-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for JAMES DIAZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2012759.) filed by Jesse Drewniak.Follow up on Objection on 8/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for LIA ERNST to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2012753.) filed by Jesse Drewniak.Follow up on Objection on 8/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for EMMA BOND to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # BNHDC-2012752.) filed by Jesse Drewniak.Follow up on Objection on 8/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for ZACHARY HEIDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2012747.) filed by Jesse Drewniak.Follow up on Objection on 8/25/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SangYeob Kim on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney SangYeob Kim added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Kim, SangYeob) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Jesse Drewniak Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Jesse Drewniak(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2012664 filed by Jesse Drewniak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court 5.1.18 Order, #2 Exhibit B -- Circuit Court 8.22.18 Motion for Reconsideration Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver CBP, #5 Summons - Waiver Border Patrol, #6 Summons - Waiver Qualter, #7 Summons - Waiver Forkey, #8 Summons - Waiver Garcia)(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less