This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:49:25 (UTC).

Drewery v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Drewery filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02531

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jeremy Phillip Drewery

Beaumont, TX 77720

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

2255 AUSA

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Memphis

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Mark Alan Erskine

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Reagan Fondren

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

8 #1

envelope

#8

(#8) PRO SE MOTION to Correct AUSA's misstatement by Jeremy Phillip Drewery. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/14/2020. The government is granted an extension of 30 days after the receipt of the trial transcripts to file its amended response to Defendants motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Erskine on behalf of United States of America (Erskine, Mark) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Pro Se Complaint, #3 Order w/ proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Fondren, Reagan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Reagan Fondren on behalf of United States of America (Fondren, Reagan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing United States to Respond, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #3

Judicial Cards

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Jeremy Phillip Drewery against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO SE MOTION to Correct AUSA's misstatement by Jeremy Phillip Drewery. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/14/2020. The government is granted an extension of 30 days after the receipt of the trial transcripts to file its amended response to Defendants motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Erskine on behalf of United States of America (Erskine, Mark) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Pro Se Complaint, #3 Order w/ proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Fondren, Reagan) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Reagan Fondren on behalf of United States of America (Fondren, Reagan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing United States to Respond, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Jeremy Phillip Drewery against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less