This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:03:10 (UTC).

Drew v. 3M Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Drew filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02019

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Drew

Defendants

3M Company, The

DuPont de Nemours Inc

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

Tyco Fire Products LP

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

Chemguard Inc

National Foam Inc

EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Chemours Company FC LLC, The

Arkema Inc

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

Dowdupont Inc

Dynax Corporation

Clariant Corporation

AGC Chemicals Americas Inc

Corteva Inc

UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc

Carrier Global Corporation

BASF Corporation

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A London

Attorney at Douglas and London PC

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Tate J Kunkle

Attorney at Douglas and London PC

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10560105.), filed by Charles Drew. Service due by 9/22/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2022
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/24/2022), Drew v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2019-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Mississippi (sshe, ) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10560105.), filed by Charles Drew. Service due by 9/22/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 06/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AGC Chemical Americas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DowDuPont Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dupont De Nemours Inc is a litigant