This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 22:35:13 (UTC).

Drevaleva v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Drevaleva filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against U S Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Johnson and John F. Robbenhaar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00761

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

Referral Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva

San Francisco, CA 94121

Defendants

U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs

Peter O'Rourke

Robert Wilkie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christine Hyojin Lyman

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - District of New Mexico

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adrienne Zack

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, P.O. Box 36055

San Francsico, CA 94102-3495

 

Court Documents

#566

(#566) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #564 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #527 Judgment, #544 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (bap) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#564

(#564) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING/STRIKING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FILED AFTER FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL and ORDER RESTRICTING FURTHER CERTAIN FILINGS IN THIS CASE: STRIKING MOTIONS #545 , #550 , #553 , #555 , #557 , #558 , and #560 ; DENYING MOTIONS #552 and #559 by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. THE Court hereby ORDERS that: THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY FURTHER FILINGS BY PLAINTIFF IN THIS CASE OTHER THAN THOSE FILINGS THAT ARE NECESSARY TO PERFECT HER APPEAL. (cmm) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#558

(#558) Second MOTION to Appoint an Attorney in a Forma Pauperis Case by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#557

(#557) Second MOTION for Permission for the Electronic Case Filing by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#552

(#564) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING/STRIKING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FILED AFTER FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL and ORDER RESTRICTING FURTHER CERTAIN FILINGS IN THIS CASE: STRIKING MOTIONS #545 , #550 , #553 , #555 , #557 , #558 , and #560 ; DENYING MOTIONS #552 and #559 by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. THE Court hereby ORDERS that: THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY FURTHER FILINGS BY PLAINTIFF IN THIS CASE OTHER THAN THOSE FILINGS THAT ARE NECESSARY TO PERFECT HER APPEAL. (cmm) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#545

(#562) RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to Amend My Joint Status Report and a Provisional Discovery Plan, The F.R.C.P. Rule 15(b)(2) filed by Peter O'Rourke, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie. (Lyman, Christine) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#544

(#566) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #564 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #527 Judgment, #544 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (bap) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#532

(#565) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #532 Notice of Appeal filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. USCA Case Number 21-2139. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cmm) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#527

(#566) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #564 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #527 Judgment, #544 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (bap) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1,358 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#566) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #564 Memorandum Opinion and Order, #527 Judgment, #544 Memorandum Opinion and Order, by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (bap) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#565) NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #532 Notice of Appeal filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. USCA Case Number 21-2139. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cmm) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#564) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING/STRIKING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FILED AFTER FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL and ORDER RESTRICTING FURTHER CERTAIN FILINGS IN THIS CASE: STRIKING MOTIONS #545 , #550 , #553 , #555 , #557 , #558 , and #560 ; DENYING MOTIONS #552 and #559 by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. THE Court hereby ORDERS that: THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY FURTHER FILINGS BY PLAINTIFF IN THIS CASE OTHER THAN THOSE FILINGS THAT ARE NECESSARY TO PERFECT HER APPEAL. (cmm) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#563) RESPONSE in Opposition re #553 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion to Transfer My Lawsuits from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico filed by Peter O'Rourke, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie. (Lyman, Christine) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#562) RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to Amend My Joint Status Report and a Provisional Discovery Plan, The F.R.C.P. Rule 15(b)(2) filed by Peter O'Rourke, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie. (Lyman, Christine) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#561) RESPONSE in Opposition re #550 MOTION Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to File the First Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Peter O'Rourke, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie. (Lyman, Christine) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#560) First MOTION for an Order That: 1) VACATES THE PHRASE IN THE SEPTEMBER 14, 2021 ORDER (DOC. No. 491) THAT STRUCK ALL My POST-JULY 11, 2019 JUDGMENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS 2) THAT RETROACTIVELY GRANTS ME WITH PERMISSION TO FILE ALL MY POST-JULY 11, 2019 JUDGMENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS 3) THAT ORDERS THE REAL DEFENDANTS THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS AND ITS SECRETARY MR. DENIS RICHARD McDONOUGH (AS OPPOSED TO AUSA MS. LYMAN) TO RESPOND ON THE MERITS OF ALL MY POST-JULY 11, 2019 JUDGMENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS AND ON THE MERITS OF ALL MOTIONS TO VACATE THE JUDGMENT by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#559) Motion - Request for Permission to File a Supplemental Brief in Support to First Motion to Vacate #555 by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) Modified docket relationship on 11/29/2021 (cmm). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#558) Second MOTION to Appoint an Attorney in a Forma Pauperis Case by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#557) Second MOTION for Permission for the Electronic Case Filing by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (cmm) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
559 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO HON. LUCY H. KOH***Following the case reassignment to Judge Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, September 26, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). Plaintiffs Motion to Transfer (ECF no. #5 ) filed on July 2, 2018 is hereby set for October 25, 2018 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as the referral judge for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 7/6/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. Clerk to reassign case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Responses due by 7/16/2018. Replies due by 7/23/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/ 18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Peter O'Rourke, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. Filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/13/2021.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less