This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2021 at 08:47:57 (UTC).

DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

Defendant

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Interested Parties

DENNIS HENNESSEY

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

ONEWEST BANK FSB

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

SHEILA HENNESSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 303C

Beverly, MA 01915

Defendant Attorneys

BRETT L. MESSINGER

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

2 Monument Square, Suite 505

Portland, ME 04101

ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

100 Pearl Street, 13Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Interested Party Attorney

ASHLEY E. EILER

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

100 Middle Street Plaza

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

summons and complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

State Court Record

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/24/2021. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/1/2021. Motions due by 12/15/2021. Ready for Trial on 2/2/2022. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(MESSINGER, BRETT) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.(MESSINGER, BRETT) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH M. LACOMBE on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY (LACOMBE, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (MESSINGER, BRETT) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2513568.), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.(MESSINGER, BRETT) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/6/2021. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/6/2021. (bfa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY : Answer due by 7/6/2021. (bfa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number RE-21-13. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 9/27/2021) Fee due by 6/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 summons and complaint)(bfa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Onewest Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant