This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

Dreadfulwater v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Dreadfulwater filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Dreadfulwater

Defendants

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Atrium Medical Corp., et. al.

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Todd Mathews

Attorney at Gori Julian & Associates PC

156 N Main St

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Katherine E. Unger Davis

Attorney at Dechert LLP

2929 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19104

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Getinge AB by Henry Dreadfulwater(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #3

Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service-Maquet

1 #2

Summons - Waiver Waiver of Service-Atrium

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1917245 filed by Henry Dreadfulwater. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waivert)(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 1/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 3/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Unger Davis, Katherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation by Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Atrium Medical Corporation. Served/Mailed on 1/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 3/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Unger Davis, Katherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Getinge AB by Henry Dreadfulwater(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 20-cv-26-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-1917245 filed by Henry Dreadfulwater. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waivert)(Mathews, D.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.