This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 07:19:58 (UTC).

DRAUGHON v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 DRAUGHON filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SAUL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH T. HEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04015

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH T. HEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STACIE L DRAUGHON

Defendant

ANDREW SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

F. MICHAEL FRIEDMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF F. MICHAEL FRIEDMAN

Po Box 467

Drexel Hill, PA 19026-0467

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 8/19/20.8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Social Security Magistrate Consent by STACIE L DRAUGHON.. (FRIEDMAN, F.) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 consent)(jaa, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental Standing Procedural Order. 8/20/20 Entered and Copies e-mailed. (kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM, ETC.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 8/19/20.8/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by STACIE L DRAUGHON.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FRIEDMAN, F.) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by STACIE L DRAUGHON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(FRIEDMAN, F.) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less