This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:43:39 (UTC).

Drange et al v. Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Drange filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jodie Drange

Andy Drange

Defendants

Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Martha Sheehy

Attorney at SHEEHY LAW FIRM

P. O. Box 584

Billings, MT 59103-0584

Randall G. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

Murry Warhank

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 N Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601-4298

David C. Dalthorp

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 N Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601-4298

Evan M. Selik

Attorney at McCATHERN, LLP

523 West 6Th Street, #830

Los Angeles, CA 90014

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

28 #1

Exhibit

#28

#27

26 #2

Text of Proposed Order

26 #1

Declaration

#26

#22

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C. Affidavit of Scott Dawson

1 #2

Exhibit B. State Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A. State Summons

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts I and II, Second Amend. Complaint filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Counts I and II, Second Amend. Complaint Martha Sheehy appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Selik, Evan) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Second Amended Complaint erroneously filed May 6 2020 is hereby struck from the record. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/18/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Amend/Correct #22 Amended Complaint Evan M. Selik appearing for Plaintiff Andy Drange (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Selik, Evan) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan P. Watters: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 5/8/2020. (Law Clerk: J. Wolff), (JEH) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUPPLEMENT re #15 Preliminary Pretrial Statement, by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Objection to Filings of 2d Amended Complaint without Leave. (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketRemark: PHV attorney Evan Selik is now a registered user and can receive electronic notices in this case. (EMH) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STRICKEN FROM RECORD PER COURT ORDER E.C.F. #27 . AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Does 1-100, Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy) (Warhank, Murry) Modified on 5/18/2020 to update docket entry(EMH). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Counts I and II of Amended Complaint filed by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re Counts I and II of Amended Complaint Martha Sheehy appearing for Defendant Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complete Policy) (Warhank, Murry) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT filed in state court against Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Jodie Drange, Andy Drange. (JEH) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT DOCUMENTS, file received electronically from Yellowstone County, Case File DV 19-1733. (Attachments: #1 State court documents, #2 Transfer receipt) (JEH) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal. (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Sheehy, Martha) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/1/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/24/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/1/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. READ ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 3/26/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2461595. (EMH) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andy Drange, Jodie Drange from Thirteenth Judicial District Court- Yellowstone County, case number DV 19-1733. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Summons, #2 Exhibit B. State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C. Affidavit of Scott Dawson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMH) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mountain West Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martha Sheehy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall G. Nelson