This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:37:59 (UTC).

Drake v. Amczyk et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Drake filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Amczyk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Rutherford and Sam R Cummings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00427

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rebecca Rutherford

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klager E Drake

Brownsville, TX 78520

Defendants

Pawan R Sharma

Texas Lottery Commission

Multi-State Lottery Association

Rakhee P Sharma

7-Eleven Inc

M Amczyk

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/10/2019) (mla) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Klager E Drake. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #14 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit by Klager E Drake. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#14

(#14) JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's claims in the above- styled and -numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the prior imposition of sanctions by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/6/2019) (axm) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER Adopting #10 Findings and Recommendation. Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED and his Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the prior imposition of sanctions by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/6/2019) (axm) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#10

(#10) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court recommends that Plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this case be dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's re- filing after he has complied with the sanction order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/22/2019) (mla) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Klager E Drake, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) MOTION to Recuse Magistrate Rebecca Rutherford filed by Klager E Drake. (mla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #10 Magistrate's Recommendations and Request for a Evidentiary Hearing filed by Klager E Drake. (mla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00019. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 02/20/2019)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Klager E. Drake re: #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed.(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Klager E Drake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/10/2019) (mla) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USCA Case Number 19-10382 in USCA5 for #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Klager E Drake. (epm) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal re #15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Klager E Drake. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #14 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit by Klager E Drake. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's claims in the above- styled and -numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the prior imposition of sanctions by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/6/2019) (axm) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Adopting #10 Findings and Recommendation. Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED and his Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the prior imposition of sanctions by the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/6/2019) (axm) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Recuse Magistrate Rebecca Rutherford filed by Klager E Drake. (mla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to #10 Magistrate's Recommendations and Request for a Evidentiary Hearing filed by Klager E Drake. (mla) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court recommends that Plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis be denied and that this case be dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's re- filing after he has complied with the sanction order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/22/2019) (mla) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00019. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of Klager E. Drake re: #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed.(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma PauperisMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Klager E Drake, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Klager E Drake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dnoriega, 1) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.