This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:18:55 (UTC).

Drake-Tyner et al v. Hatcher et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Drake-Tyner filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hatcher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Carl W. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00627

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Carl W. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Penny Drake-Tyner

Michael Hansen

Defendants

Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.

Nicolas L Hatcher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lane S. Kay

Attorney at .

725 S. Sixth St.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Lane Steven Kay

Attorney at Law Office of Lane S. Kay

819 S. Sixth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorney

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Louis

8925 W Russell Rd, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Proposed Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Motions due by 2/21/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Penny Drake-Tyner, Michael Hansen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kay, Lane) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court Clark County NV, Case Number A-18-784432-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5503296) by Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER granting #9 Proposed Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Motions due by 2/21/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Penny Drake-Tyner, Michael Hansen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kay, Lane) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/15/2019. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court Clark County NV, Case Number A-18-784432-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5503296) by Geiser Bros. Design & Development, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy A Clark