This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2021 at 08:23:57 (UTC).

EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DR REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-18623

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.

Respondent

DR. JEROME ZELDIS

In Re

IN RE EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES LTD. FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREGORY D. MILLER

Attorney at RIVKIN RADLER LLP

25 Main Street, Suite 501, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER that the #1 Ex Parte Application of DRL is granted in its entirety, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/11/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.. (MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Text of Proposed Order

1 #6

Exhibit C to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

1 #5

Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

1 #4

Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

1 #3

Declaration of Gregory D. Miller

1 #2

Certification

1 #1

Brief in Support of the Ex Parte Application

#1

(#1) APPLICATION/PETITION for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding for by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of the Ex Parte Application, #2 Certification, #3 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #6 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that the #1 Ex Parte Application of DRL is granted in its entirety, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/11/2020. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton. (jr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 49, receipt number NEW043879 (jr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketClerk's Note: Due to the increase in fees that went into effect on 12/1/2020, the filing fee is $49, not $47. (jr) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The application for an order to conduct discovery #1 filed by Gregory Miller on 12/9/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a APPLICATION/PETITION. The correct event is LETTERS ROGATORY found under COMPLAINTS AND OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. Please contact the Clerk's Office at 973-622-4810 before 1:00 p.m. to pay the $47 filing fee. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jr, ) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.. (MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION/PETITION for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding for by DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of the Ex Parte Application, #2 Certification, #3 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #6 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory David Miller