This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2020 at 08:30:34 (UTC).

Dr. Lisa Edwards et al v. Dr. Scott Price et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Dr Lisa Edwards filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Dr Scott Price. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01838

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dr. Stephany Glover

Inglewood, CA 90305

Dr. Lisa Edwards

Inglewood, CA 90305

Century Academy for Excellence

2400 W 85Th Street

Inglewood, CA 90305

Defendants

Lennox Unified School District

Dr. Scott Price

Becki Blanco

Omar Lopez-Luna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen B Felahy

Attorney at Felahy Employment Lawyers

550 South Hope Street Suite 2655

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence, Lisa Edwards, Stephany Glover. (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#12

(#12) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #9 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#10

(#10) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#9

(#9) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Lisa Edwards (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#8

(#8) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Stephany Glover (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#13

(#13) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #10 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#11

(#11) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #8 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover, upon Defendant Lennox School District served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenia Guerra (capacity not indicated) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons filed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover as to Kenia Guerra, Lennox Unified School District. (Proof of service is unsigned, see separately filed Proof of Service) (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#2) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Lennox Unified School District. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

1 #1

CV71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Becki Blanco, Lennox Unified School District, Omar Lopez-Luna, Scott Price.Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiffs Lisa Edwards, Century Academy for Excellence, Stephany Glover. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence, Lisa Edwards, Stephany Glover. (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #9 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Century Academy for Excellence (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Lisa Edwards (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Plaintiff Stephany Glover (Felahy, Allen) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #10 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee #8 (yl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover, upon Defendant Lennox School District served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kenia Guerra (capacity not indicated) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE of Summons filed by Plaintiffs Dr. Lisa Edwards, Dr. Stephany Glover as to Kenia Guerra, Lennox Unified School District. (Proof of service is unsigned, see separately filed Proof of Service) (gk) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Lennox Unified School District. (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Becki Blanco, Lennox Unified School District, Omar Lopez-Luna, Scott Price.Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by plaintiffs Lisa Edwards, Century Academy for Excellence, Stephany Glover. (Attachments: #1 CV71) (esa) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Century Academy for Excellence is a litigant

Latest cases where Lennox Unified School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allen B Felahy