This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2020 at 11:16:43 (UTC).

D.Q. et al v. Santa Fe Public Schools et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 D Q filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Santa Fe Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W. Skavdahl and Mark L. Carman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00654

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W. Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Mark L. Carman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S.T.

D.Q.

Defendants

Gary F. Gregor

Santa Fe Public Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maggie H Lane

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

500 4Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Carolyn M. Nichols

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

500 4Th St. Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Alicia Consuelo Lopez

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

500 4Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine A. Howington

Attorney at Esquivel & Howington, LLC

111 Lomas Blvd., N.W., Suite 203

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Martin R. Esquivel

Attorney at Esquivel & Howington, LLC

111 Lomas Blvd., N.W., Suite 203

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Jerry A. Walz

Attorney at Walz and Associates

133 Eubank Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87123

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Plaintiff Expert Witness Designation Deadline-5/17/2021; Defendant Expert Witness Designation Deadline-6/16/2021; Other Fact Witness Deadline-7/16/2021. Discovery due 8/30/2021; Motions Deadline 8/30/2021; Motions Response Deadline 9/13/2021; Motions Reply Deadline 9/20/2021. Motions in Limine Deadline-10/8/2021; Motions in Limine Response Deadline-10/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 1:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 through 11/19/2021 at 9:00 AM. (kew) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D.Q., S.T. Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Nichols, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary F. Gregor, Santa Fe Public Schools Defendants' Joint Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#8

(#8) Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2020. (kew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Santa Fe Public Schools (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing:Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 03:45 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Connect to the Court at (888) 398-2342; Access Code: 6705030; Security Code: 2533. Other details in Notice. (kew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Santa Fe Public Schools. (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#3

(#3) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Civil Rights Violations, Title IX Violations, Negligence, and Other Tortious Conduct by Gary F. Gregor. (Esquivel, Martin) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin R. Esquivel on behalf of Gary F. Gregor (Esquivel, Martin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit D_State Court Docket

1 #5

Exhibit C_Consent by Defendant Gregor

1 #4

Exhibit B_Pleadings Served

1 #3

Exhibit A_Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Santa Fe Public Schools from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-DV-2020-01187. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Santa Fe Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A_Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B_Pleadings Served, #5 Exhibit C_Consent by Defendant Gregor, #6 Exhibit D_State Court Docket)(Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Plaintiff Expert Witness Designation Deadline-5/17/2021; Defendant Expert Witness Designation Deadline-6/16/2021; Other Fact Witness Deadline-7/16/2021. Discovery due 8/30/2021; Motions Deadline 8/30/2021; Motions Response Deadline 9/13/2021; Motions Reply Deadline 9/20/2021. Motions in Limine Deadline-10/8/2021; Motions in Limine Response Deadline-10/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 1:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 through 11/19/2021 at 9:00 AM. (kew) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by D.Q., S.T. Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Nichols, Carolyn) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary F. Gregor, Santa Fe Public Schools Defendants' Joint Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2020. (kew) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Santa Fe Public Schools (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Santa Fe Public Schools re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing of Certified State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record) (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing:Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 03:45 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman. Connect to the Court at (888) 398-2342; Access Code: 6705030; Security Code: 2533. Other details in Notice. (kew) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Santa Fe Public Schools. (Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Civil Rights Violations, Title IX Violations, Negligence, and Other Tortious Conduct by Gary F. Gregor. (Esquivel, Martin) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin R. Esquivel on behalf of Gary F. Gregor (Esquivel, Martin) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and United States Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (dr) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7195143 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Santa Fe Public Schools (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Santa Fe Public Schools from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-DV-2020-01187. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Santa Fe Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A_Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B_Pleadings Served, #5 Exhibit C_Consent by Defendant Gregor, #6 Exhibit D_State Court Docket)(Walz, Jerry) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.T. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia Consuelo Lopez