This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2021 at 08:04:12 (UTC).

Dphrepaulezz v. Bayer Healthcare LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Dphrepaulezz filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Bayer Healthcare LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04480

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michaele Dphrepaulezz

Defendants

Bayer Healthcare LLC

Elanco Animal Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Blair E. Reed

Attorney at Bursor and Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Yeremey O. Krivoshey

Attorney at Bursor Fisher, P.A.

1990 North California Boulevard, Suite 940

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

John P Mandler

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S Seventh St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Andrew Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Blake Anthony Angelino

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

311 S. Wacker Dr., #4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Naoki Stephen Kaneko

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#18

#24

(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#23

(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#20

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

#15

14 #1

Declaration Laura Sexton

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by John P Mandler, P (Mandler, John) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrea Roberts Pierson (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Andrew Campbell (Campbell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. by Blake Anthony Angelino (Angelino, Blake) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-02439 (ph) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRemark: Case file electronically transferred to the Northern District of Illinois (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Illinois. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for August 26, 2021 is continued to November 4, 2021 at 10:00 AM. All parties shall attend by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. Joint Case Management Statement due by October 28, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RELATING CASES 3:21-cv-02227-RS and 3:21-cv-02439-EMC. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 04/16/2021. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/14/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michaele Dphrepaulezz.. (Krivoshey, Yeremey) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/20/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Krivoshey, Yeremey) (Filed on 4/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer Healthcare LLC, Elanco Animal Health, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15796914.). Filed byMichaele Dphrepaulezz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krivoshey, Yeremey) (Filed on 4/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/30/2021.] (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELANCO ANIMAL HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer HealthCare LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Naoki S Kaneko