This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:27:05 (UTC).

D&P Holdings, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 D P Holdings, Inc was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-03229

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D&P Holdings, Inc

Defendants

The Hanover Insurance Company

Nova Casualty Company

AIX Specialty Insurance Company

Thomas A. Rush

Meredith Ramsey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Faris Muriby

Randy Sorrels

Defendant Attorney

John Lee Dagley

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#15

(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Meredith Ramsey

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re: Initial Response Date by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Meredith Ramsey, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas A. Rush served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nova Casualty Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Hanover Insurance Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AIX Specialty Insurance Company served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Meredith Ramsey, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

5 #3

Summons

5 #1

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Meredith Ramsey, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Meredith Ramsey)(Dagley, John) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION re: Initial Response Date by AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Meredith Ramsey, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company, filed.(Dagley, John) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Thomas A. Rush served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Nova Casualty Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Hanover Insurance Company served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to AIX Specialty Insurance Company served on 9/30/2022, answer due 10/21/2022, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, Meredith Ramsey, Thomas A. Rush, The Hanover Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Issuance of Summons as to D&P Holdings, Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Case Info Sheet by D&P Holdings, Inc, filed.(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2022 at 11:20 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against D&P Holdings, Inc, The Hanover Insurance Company, Nova Casualty Company, AIX Specialty Insurance Company, Thomas A. Rush, Meredith Ramsey (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28810024) filed by D&P Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sorrels, Randy) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less