This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 07:56:35 (UTC).

Dozois et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Dozois filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Corrigan and Patricia D. Barksdale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00951

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

Referral Judge

Patricia D. Barksdale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clark Dozois

Marguerite Dozois

Defendant

Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Christopher Melli

Attorney at Cohen Law Group

350 N Lake Destiny Rd.

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Fortier

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Vincent Alexander Fernandez

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig

400 N. Ashley Drive

Tampa, FL 33602

Troy J. Seibert

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4327

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendant's reply, limited to 7 pages, shall be filed no later than 11/30/2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 11/17/2021. (SRW) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Reply and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Seibert, Troy) Modified to edit text on 11/8/2021 (KKH). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Related case(s): No (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failing to Provide Pre-Suit Notice filed by Clark Dozois, Marguerite Dozois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Order)(Melli, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Clark Dozois, Marguerite Dozois. Related case(s): No (Melli, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Clark Dozois, Marguerite Dozois. (Melli, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failing to Provide Pre-Suit Notice by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MD) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Christopher Melli on behalf of Clark Dozois, Marguerite Dozois (Melli, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest with Jury Demand originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, Flagler County on 8/2/21, case number 2021 CA 387 filed by Marguerite Dozois, Clark Dozois.(KKH) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:21-cv-951-TJC-PDB. (NAS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 7th Judicial Circuit, case number 2021 CA 000387 filed in State Court on 8/2/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18744541 filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Demand & Estimate, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - C. Dozois Citizenship Documents, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - M. Dozois Citizenship Documents, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy J. Seibert