This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:09:15 (UTC).

Downtown Music Publishing LLC et al v. Peloton Interactive, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Downtown Music Publishing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Peloton Interactive, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02426

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

ole Media Management, L.P.

CYPMP, LLC

Big Deal Music, LLC

Peer International Corp.

Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC

Reservoir Media Management, Inc.

Songs of Peer, Ltd.

The Richmond Organization, Inc.

The Royalty Network Inc.

PSO Limited

Peermusic, Ltd.

Peermusic III, Ltd.

Downtown Music Publishing LLC

Peertunes, Ltd.

Round Hill Music LLC

TuneCore, Inc.

Peer International Corporation

Greensleeves Publishing Limited

National Music Publishers Association, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Peloton Interactive, Inc.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Emily Weissler

Attorney at Clarick Gueron Reisbaum LLP

220 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10001

Darren Wright Johnson

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Jay Cohen

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Elana Rose Beale

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Kenneth L. Steinthal

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (SF2)

101 2Nd Street Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Emily T. Chen

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Christopher Yook

Attorney at King & Spalding

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006

David Paul Mattern

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (DC)

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-4706

Jason Blake Cunningham

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#63

#62

61 #1

Exhibit 1 - Apr. 9, 2018 Letter from J. Cohen to H. Kushi

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

47 #1

Exhibit A - List of Infringed Works

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A-List of Plaintiffs' Infringed Works

#1

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE of Name Change. Document filed by ole Media Management, L.P.. (Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jay Cohen dated June 24, 2019. Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, National Music Publishers Association, Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) DECLARATION of Elana R. Beale in Support re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff's Counterclaims.. Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, National Music Publishers Association, Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Apr. 9, 2018 Letter from J. Cohen to H. Kushi)(Beale, Elana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff's Counterclaims. . Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, National Music Publishers Association, Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P.. (Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant-Counterclaim Plaintiff's Counterclaims. Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, National Music Publishers Association, Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Rose Beale on behalf of Greensleeves Publishing Limited, Me Gusta Music, LLC, Raleigh Music Publishing LLC, STB Music, Inc., TuneCore, Inc.. (Beale, Elana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Darren Wright Johnson on behalf of Greensleeves Publishing Limited, Me Gusta Music, LLC, Raleigh Music Publishing LLC, STB Music, Inc., TuneCore, Inc.. (Johnson, Darren) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, National Music Publishers Association, Inc., PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P.. Document filed by Peloton Interactive, Inc..(Steinthal, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #46 Letter,, filed by Peermusic, Ltd., CYPMP, LLC, Peertunes, Ltd., The Royalty Network Inc., The Richmond Organization, Inc., Songs of Peer, Ltd., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Peer International Corp., National Music Publishers Association, Inc., Peermusic III, Ltd., PSO Limited, ole Media Management, L.P., Round Hill Music LLC, Big Deal Music, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/6/2019) (jca) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...IT IS SO ORDERED this 6th day of June, 2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/6/2019) (ne) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Richmond Organization, Inc..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wesbild Inc., Corporate Parent Wesbild Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Persis Holdings Ltd. for Reservoir Media Management, Inc.. Document filed by Reservoir Media Management, Inc..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Peermusic III, Ltd. for PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Songs of Peer, Ltd.; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Peermusic III, Ltd.. Document filed by PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Songs of Peer, Ltd..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Check Your Pulse Music Publishing, LLC, Corporate Parent Fuji Music Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Fuji Media Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Pulse Music Group for CYPMP, LLC. Document filed by CYPMP, LLC.(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Emmelou, LLC for Big Deal Music, LLC. Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC.(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board for ole Media Management, L.P.. Document filed by ole Media Management, L.P..(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Downtown Music Holdings (IOM) Limited for Downtown Music Publishing LLC. Document filed by Downtown Music Publishing LLC.(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peloton Interactive, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Big Deal Music, LLC, CYPMP, LLC, Downtown Music Publishing LLC, PSO Limited, Peer International Corp., Peermusic III, Ltd., Peermusic, Ltd., Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., Round Hill Music LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., The Richmond Organization, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, ole Media Management, L.P.. (Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Peloton Interactive, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16519989)Document filed by The Richmond Organization, Inc., Peermusic, Ltd., ole Media Management, L.P., Downtown Music Publishing LLC, Round Hill Music LLC, PSO Limited, Big Deal Music, LLC, Peertunes, Ltd., Reservoir Media Management, Inc., The Royalty Network Inc., Ultra International Music Publishing, LLC, Peermusic III, Ltd., CYPMP, LLC, Songs of Peer, Ltd., Peer International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Plaintiffs' Infringed Works)(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Downtown Music Publishing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Greensleeves Publishing Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Tunecore, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ole Media Management, L.P. is a litigant