This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:17:03 (UTC).

Downs v. Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Downs filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celestine Downs

Defendants

PMAB, LLC

Credit Bureau Systems, Inc.

Fresno Credit Bureau

GLA Collection Co., Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Fresno Credit Bureau doing business as Credit Bureau USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Hays Lawson

Attorney at Lawson at Law, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

James R. McKenzie

Attorney at James R. McKenzie Attorney, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

Defendant Attorneys

William E. Smith, III

Attorney at Kightlinger & Gray, LLP - IN

3620 Blackiston Boulevard, Suite 200

New Albany, IN 47150

Melissa R. Lamkin

Attorney at Knightlinger & Gray, LLP

3620 Blackison Boulevard, Suite 200

New Albany, IN 47150

Brian S. Katz

Attorney at Law Office of Brian S. Katz

226 Broadway, Suite 1, P.O. Box 2903

Paducah, KY 42002-2903

Boyd William Gentry

Attorney at Law Office of Boyd W. Gentry, LLC

4031 Colonel Glenn Highway, Suite 100

Beavercreek, OH 45431

John M. Williams

Attorney at Wiilliams Kilpatrick PLLC

3151 Beaumont Center Circle, Suite 375

Lexington, KY 40513

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER: 1. Parties' #22 Motion to Drop Defendant Fresno Credit Bureau is GRANTED; 2. Dft Fresno Credit Bureau is DROPPED as a party from this action; 3. All claims against Fresno Credit Bureau are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees; 5. This Order has no impact on the remaining claims and Dfts in this action. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/12/2019.(SLH)cc: COR (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that parties SHALL FILE either a joint stipulation of dismissal or joint status report by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/17/2019.(GLD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/17/2019)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Fresno Credit Bureau d/b/a Credit Bureau USA as a Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Celestine Downs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Celestine Downs (Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER: re #19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer: (1) parties' motion #19 is GRANTED; and (2) Defendant Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., SHALL file any responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by November 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/16/2019.(STC)cc: COR (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#19

(#19) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer by Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., Celestine Downs. (Katz, Brian) Modified filers on 10/16/2019 (STC). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#18

(#18) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#4

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Boyd Gentry. #4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Fresno Credit Bureau without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fresno Credit Bureau, GLA Collection Co., Inc., PMAB, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summons Tendered, PMAB

1 #4

Summons Tendered, GLA

1 #3

Summons Tendered, Fresno Credit

1 #2

Summons Tendered, Equifax

1 #1

Summons Tendered, Credit Bureau Systems

#1

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PMAB, LLC.(Smith, William) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER: 1. Parties' #22 Motion to Drop Defendant Fresno Credit Bureau is GRANTED; 2. Dft Fresno Credit Bureau is DROPPED as a party from this action; 3. All claims against Fresno Credit Bureau are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees; 5. This Order has no impact on the remaining claims and Dfts in this action. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/12/2019.(SLH)cc: COR (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that parties SHALL FILE either a joint stipulation of dismissal or joint status report by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/17/2019.(GLD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) JOINT MOTION to Drop Defendant Fresno Credit Bureau d/b/a Credit Bureau USA as a Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Celestine Downs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Celestine Downs (Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: re #19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer: (1) parties' motion #19 is GRANTED; and (2) Defendant Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., SHALL file any responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by November 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/16/2019.(STC)cc: COR (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #19 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer by Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. (STC) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer by Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., Celestine Downs. (Katz, Brian) Modified filers on 10/16/2019 (STC). (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Williams, John) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Williams, John) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by PMAB, LLC.(Smith, William) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of PMAB, LLC (Smith, William) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GLA Collection Co., Inc.. (Smith, William) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Smith, III on behalf of GLA Collection Co., Inc. (Smith, William) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Bureau Systems, Inc.. (Katz, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Katz on behalf of Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. (Katz, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Boyd Gentry. #4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Fresno Credit Bureau without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fresno Credit Bureau. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (STC) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Credit Bureau Systems, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Fresno Credit Bureau, GLA Collection Co., Inc., PMAB, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4468528), filed by Celestine Downs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered, Credit Bureau Systems, #2 Summons Tendered, Equifax, #3 Summons Tendered, Fresno Credit, #4 Summons Tendered, GLA, #5 Summons Tendered, PMAB, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Bureau Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PMAB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESNO CREDIT BUREAU is a litigant