This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:48:51 (UTC).

Downing v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Downing filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01546

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Billy Downing

Defendant

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Pennington

Attorney at PENNINGTON LAW FIRM LLC

1023 Edenton Street

Birmingham, AL 35242

Defendant Attorney

Jason A Walters

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 5Th Avenue North, P O Box 830709

Birmingham, AL 35283-0709

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 11/9/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Walters, Jason) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Downing. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (MEB2) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Mailed certified mail (MEB2) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Billy Downing. Request originally filed 10/5/2020 (MEB2) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Billy Downing.(SRD) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 11/9/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Walters, Jason) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Downing. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (MEB2) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Mailed certified mail (MEB2) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Billy Downing. Request originally filed 10/5/2020 (MEB2) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3687377 (B4601108907). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Billy Downing.(SRD). (Pennington, John) Modified on 10/6/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by Billy Downing.(SRD) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less