This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2022 at 10:33:52 (UTC).

Downing v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Downing filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00447

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gail Downing

Defendant

Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter C. Robison

Attorney at Cornelius & Collins, LLP

211 Athens Way, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37228

Rebecca Wells Demaree

Attorney at Cornelius & Collins, LLP

P O Box 190695, 211 Athens Way

Nashville, TN 37228

Seth R. Granda

Attorney at King & Ballow

315 Union Street, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Goff Sanders

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

Stephen C. Stovall

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (Nashville Office)

611 Commerce Street, Suite 3102

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Disciplinary Record

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m., Wednesday, September 21, 2022, by telephone conference, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant or its counsel or otherwise ensure that Defendant is aware of the rescheduled date. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirement that Defendant be served with process within 90 days of the filing of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Goff Sanders on behalf of Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Stovall on behalf of Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Stovall, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit A - Identification of Parent Company

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Leslie Goff Sanders and Stephen C. Stovall admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Identification of Parent Company)(Stovall, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Stovall on behalf of Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Stovall, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Goff Sanders on behalf of Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Sanders, Leslie) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED to 10:30 a.m., Wednesday, September 21, 2022, by telephone conference, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Counsel for Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant or its counsel or otherwise ensure that Defendant is aware of the rescheduled date. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirement that Defendant be served with process within 90 days of the filing of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/15/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 8/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Rebecca Wells Demaree, Peter C. Robison, and Seth R. Granda admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3612653) filed by Gail Downing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disciplinary Record, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP is a litigant