This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 21:01:21 (UTC).

Downey v. Ineos Joliet, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Downey filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ineos Joliet, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04119

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Downey

Defendants

Flint Hills Resources, LLC

Ineos Joliet, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B. Levin

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

333 Skokie Blvd., Suite 103

Northbrook, IL 60062

Steven Gene Perry

Attorney at Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.c.

333 Skokie Blvd., Suite 103

Northbrook, IL 60062

Todd M Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman

21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Michael D. Ray

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

201 S. College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

Michael Vincent Furlong

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael H. Cramer

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 11/13/2019. Oral agreed motion to extend MIDP deadline is granted and shall be completed on or before 12/18/2019. Status hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Status will be stricken if parties file dismissal documents prior to the next hearing. If case is not dismissed prior to the next hearing, parties shall be prepared to set additional case management dates. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion and by agreement of counsel, status hearing previously set for 10/23/2019 is reset for 11/13/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ineos Joliet, LLC (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#25

(#25) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - ANSWER to Complaint by Ineos Joliet, LLC(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#24

(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Given that Defendant's responsive pleading is not due until 10/18/19, the initial status conference previously set for 9/17/19 is stricken and reset for 10/23/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#23

(#23) STATUS Report by Phillip Downey (Levin, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#22

(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset initial status hearing is granted. Initial status hearing previously set for 9/18/2019 is reset for 9/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ineos Joliet, LLC by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#20

(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ineos Joliet, LLC by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

8 #1

First Amended Complaint

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Downey as to Flint Hills Resources, LLC on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 8/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 7/22/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Phillip Downey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15945902. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 11/13/2019. Oral agreed motion to extend MIDP deadline is granted and shall be completed on or before 12/18/2019. Status hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Status will be stricken if parties file dismissal documents prior to the next hearing. If case is not dismissed prior to the next hearing, parties shall be prepared to set additional case management dates. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion and by agreement of counsel, status hearing previously set for 10/23/2019 is reset for 11/13/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ineos Joliet, LLC (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - ANSWER to Complaint by Ineos Joliet, LLC(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Given that Defendant's responsive pleading is not due until 10/18/19, the initial status conference previously set for 9/17/19 is stricken and reset for 10/23/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STATUS Report by Phillip Downey (Levin, David) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset initial status hearing is granted. Initial status hearing previously set for 9/18/2019 is reset for 9/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ineos Joliet, LLC by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ineos Joliet, LLC by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ineos Joliet, LLC by Michael H. Cramer (Cramer, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Phillip Downey for leave to file First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Levin, David) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Downey as to Flint Hills Resources, LLC on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 8/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 7/22/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mma, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Flint Hills Resources, LLC (pj, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Phillip Downey by David B. Levin (Levin, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Phillip Downey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15945902. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flint Hills Resources Houston Chemical, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H. Cramer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Ray

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael V. Furlong