This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:36:11 (UTC).

Dowman v. ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Dowman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00961

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Dowman

Defendants

ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC.

ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDO I. RIVERA

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, 9Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

CATHERINE THEA BARBIERI

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD, LLP

2000 Market St., 10Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANDREW S. ESLER

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

2000 Market Street, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KELLY A. QUINN

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

2000 Market Street, #2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15786306.), filed by Kimberly Dowman.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Dowman. ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Dowman. ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE THEA BARBIERI on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(BARBIERI, CATHERINE) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. ESLER on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ESLER, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Supplement

6 #2

Supplement

6 #3

Supplement

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Quinn on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(Quinn, Kelly) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Quinn on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(Quinn, Kelly) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing:THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 6/28/2022 AT 4:00 PM IN Chambers BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. ESLER on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(ESLER, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE THEA BARBIERI on behalf of ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(BARBIERI, CATHERINE) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Dowman. ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Dowman. ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (rf, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS, INC., ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15786306.), filed by Kimberly Dowman.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of KS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW S. ESLER