This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 07:06:28 (UTC).

Dowge International Development, LTD. v. Louise Paris, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Dowge International Development, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Louise Paris, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07880

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dowge International Development, LTD.

Defendant

Louise Paris, Ltd. doing business as Me Jane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hsien Chih Kung

Attorney at Jia Law Group, P.C.

88 Pine Street, 18Th Fl

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan Mitchell Lazarus

Attorney at Lazarus & Lazarus, P.C.

240 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Jared Hale Louzon

Attorney at Lazarus & Lazarus, P.C.

240 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Hsien Chih Kung to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Summons not linked to corresponding pleading. The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hsien Chih Kung to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Civil Cover Sheet is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#4

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jared Louzon, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd. dated October 13, 2022., #4 Complaint. The request is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 11, 2022. Louise Paris, Ltd. answer due 11/11/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/14/2022) (ate) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louise Paris LTD, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Kung, Hsien) Modified on 9/16/2022 (vf). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louise Paris, Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Hale Louzon on behalf of Louise Paris, Ltd...(Louzon, Jared) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#9

(#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jared Louzon, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd. dated October 13, 2022. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Louzon, Jared) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jared Louzon, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd. dated October 13, 2022., #4 Complaint. The request is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 11, 2022. Louise Paris, Ltd. answer due 11/11/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/14/2022) (ate) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/11/2022. (ate) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jared Louzon, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd. dated October 13, 2022., #4 Complaint. The request is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 11, 2022. Louise Paris, Ltd. answer due 11/11/2022. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/14/2022) (ate) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of Louise Paris, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jared Louzon, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Louise Paris, Ltd. dated October 13, 2022. Document filed by Louise Paris, Ltd...(Louzon, Jared) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Hale Louzon on behalf of Louise Paris, Ltd...(Louzon, Jared) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Louise Paris, Ltd.. (vf) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Kung, Hsien) Modified on 9/16/2022 (vf). (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louise Paris LTD, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Louise Paris, Ltd.. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Hsien Chih Kung. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $2,797,695,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2,800,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hsien Chih Kung to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. Civil Cover Sheet is not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Hsien Chih Kung to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Summons not linked to corresponding pleading. The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hsien Chih Kung to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 9/20/2022. (vf) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kung, Hsien) Modified on 9/15/2022 (vf). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Louise Paris LTD, re: Complaint. Document filed by Dowge International Development, LTD...(Kung, Hsien) Modified on 9/15/2022 (vf). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less