This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 10:57:13 (UTC).

Dowdy v. Memorial Health Care System, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Dowdy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Memorial Health Care System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Charles E Atchley, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Charles E Atchley, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherrie Dowdy

Defendant

Memorial Health Care System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Robert McCown

Attorney at Warren & Griffin, P.C. -Dalton

513 Benjamin Way, Suite 208

Dalton, GA 30721

R Scott Jackson, Jr

Attorney at R Scott Jackson, Attorney at Law

4525 Harding Road, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37205

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A Malone

Attorney at Polsinelli PC (Nash)

401 Commerce Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Ross T Weimer

Attorney at Polsinelli (Kansas City, MO)

900 W. 48Th Street, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jason N.W. Plowman

Attorney at Polsinelli (Kansas City, MO)

900 W. 48Th Street, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Memorial Health Care System, Inc.

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#11

#12

#13

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2021 03:00 PM by telephone before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr..Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 5/17/21. (CNC) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Memorial Health Care System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CommonSpirit Health for Memorial Health Care System, Inc.. (Weimer, Ross) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Memorial Health Care System, Inc..(Weimer, Ross) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason N. W. Plowman on behalf of Defendant Memorial Health Care System, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/27/2021. (KRS) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ross T. Weimer on behalf of Defendant Memorial Health Care System, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/27/2021. (KRS) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Memorial Health Care System, Inc., #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Memorial Health Care System, Inc. (AML) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason Plowman (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3042470) by Memorial Health Care System, Inc. (JBR) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ross Weimer (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3042470) by Memorial Health Care System, Inc.. (JBR) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation re Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Memorial Health Care System, Inc.. (Malone, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/29/21. (GRE) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/29/21. (GRE) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 3/29/21. (GRE) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Memorial Health Care System, Inc. (GRE) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (GRE) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Sherrie Dowdy against Memorial Health Care System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4695369.), filed by Sherrie Dowdy. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Memorial Health Care System, Inc.)(McCown, John) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Memorial Healthcare System is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Robert McCown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R Scott Jackson, Jr