This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2021 at 10:23:20 (UTC).

DOWDELL-MCELHANEY v. GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 DOWDELL-MCELHANEY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY

Columbus, GA 31907

SHERRELL DOWDELL MCELHANEY

Columbus, GA 31907

Defendants

GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC

TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA E PALMER

800 International Tower, 229 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303

PATRICK L LAIL

229 Peachtree St Ne, 800 International Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Exhibit Memo dated 4/2/20 re: Travel Authorization

14 #1

Exhibit Summons, Charge of Discrimination and Separation Info

#14

13 #5

Exhibit D - Travel Authorization memo

13 #4

Exhibit C - Separation Notice

13 #3

Exhibit B - Summons with notes

13 #2

Exhibit A - Summons for Global Payments

13 #1

Memorandum in Support

#13

#12

#11

8 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - 410-2019-07370 - Charge of Discrimination

8 #1

Memorandum in Support Defendant Total System Services, LLC'S Brief In Suppo

#8

5 #2

Emails from Sherrell Dowdell

5 #1

Verification

#5

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE filed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint/Petition: (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Charge of Discrimination and Separation Info, #2 Exhibit Memo dated 4/2/20 re: Travel Authorization)(esl) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint/Petition : (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Summons for Global Payments, #3 Exhibit B - Summons with notes, #4 Exhibit C - Separation Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Travel Authorization memo)(esl) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 1/7/2021 (esl) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT MOTION to Stay by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC filed by PAMELA E PALMER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PALMER, PAMELA) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/3/2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/23/2020. (tlp) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC identifying Corporate Parent Global Payments Inc. for GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC. (Lail, Patrick) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re #5 Amended Complaint/Petition : by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC filed by PAMELA E PALMER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Defendant Total System Services, LLC'S Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 410-2019-07370 - Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(PALMER, PAMELA) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY as to TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC. (esl) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC. (esl) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk indicates Plaintiff paid the filing fee. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 11-24-20 (rcg) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED #1 Complaint (IFP) against GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Emails from Sherrell Dowdell)(esl) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketFiling fee Paid: $402 (manual receipt 42605) (esl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY issued at the direction of the Court. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 11/23/2020. Motion referred to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES.(esl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Filed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY.(tlp) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (IFP) against GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC filed by SHERRELL DOWDELL-MCELHANEY (Attachments: #1 EEOC Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tlp) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total System Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela Eunice Palmer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick L. Lail