This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 07:46:35 (UTC).

Dow Jones & Company v. Harris

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Dow Jones Company filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00564

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dow Jones & Company, Inc.

Defendant

Thomas Britton Harris, IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laura Lee Prather

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Congress Ave - Ste 1300

Austin, TX 78701-3285

Michael Joseph Lambert

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Congress Ave. Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

William Reid Pillifant

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Congress Ave., Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorney

Peter D. Kennedy

Attorney at Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC

401 Congress Avenue - Suite 2700

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16129549). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificates of Registration, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Examples of RWB Newsletters, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Chart of Infringed Dow Jones Copyrighted Works, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Dow Jones Reprints and Licenses Policies, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Terms of Use)(Prather, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. A - Certificates of Registration

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. B - Examples of RWB Newsletters

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. C - Chart of Infringed Dow Jones Copyrighted Works

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. D - Dow Jones Reprints and Licenses Policies

1 #6

Exhibit Ex. E - Terms of Use

#2

(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Michael J. Lambert. (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#3

(#3) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ruby Newco, LLC, Corporate Parent News Preferred Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent News Corporation for Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc. as to Thomas Britton Harris, IV. Waiver sent on 6/10/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (Lambert, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Thomas Britton Harris, IV. (Kennedy, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#7

(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Peter Kennedy: re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Proposed Orders are required when a non-dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "PROPOSED ORDER" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. (klw) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Peter Kennedy: re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Proposed Orders are required when a non-dispositive Motion is filed. DO NOT RE-FILE the entire document. Please, file ONLY the Proposed Order. Use the "PROPOSED ORDER" event from the menu and LINK the Proposed Order to your Motion. (klw) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Thomas Britton Harris, IV. (Kennedy, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc. as to Thomas Britton Harris, IV. Waiver sent on 6/10/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (Lambert, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ruby Newco, LLC, Corporate Parent News Preferred Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent News Corporation for Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Prather, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Michael J. Lambert. (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16129549). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificates of Registration, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Examples of RWB Newsletters, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Chart of Infringed Dow Jones Copyrighted Works, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Dow Jones Reprints and Licenses Policies, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Terms of Use)(Prather, Laura) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less