This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 11:25:30 (UTC).

Dove v. Melkadze et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Dove filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Melkadze. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ron Clark and Zack Hawthorn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ron Clark

Referral Judge

Zack Hawthorn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.G. Dove, Jr.

Defendants

Teimuraz G. Melkadze

GTS Transportation Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey B Badders

Attorney at Badders Law Firm - Lufkin

302 S. Bynum St.

Lufkin, TX 75904

Mariko Elizabeth Badders

Attorney at Badders Law Firm - Lufkin

302 S. Bynum St.

Lufkin, TX 75904

Defendant Attorneys

Warren Thomas McCollum

Attorney at Fenley & Bate, LLP

224 E Lufkin Avenue

Lufkin, TX 75901

Michael C. Stephenson

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Jason Andrew Powers

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Houston

24 Greeway Plaza, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77046

Matthew P. Connelly

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark Street, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Call and Final Pretrial Conference are set for 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before District Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/30/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GTS Transportation Corporation (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by L.G. Dove, Jr Notice of Initial Disclosures (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teimuraz G. Melkadze (McCollum, Warren) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew P. Connelly on behalf of GTS Transportation Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7851075. (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Stephenson on behalf of GTS Transportation Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7851042. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER governing proceedings. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by July 6, 2020. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 10:45 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/18/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#5

(#5) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) by GTS Transportation Corporation.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) by Teimuraz G. Melkadze.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by L.G. Dove, Jr.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

2 #5

Exhibit Ex. D

2 #4

Exhibit Ex. C

2 #2

Exhibit Ex. A

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Teimuraz G. Melkadze First Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D)(McCollum, Warren) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn: Scheduling Conference held in chambers on 8/5/2020. (ttp, ) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Call and Final Pretrial Conference are set for 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Jury Selection and Trial are set for 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Lufkin) before District Judge Ron Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/30/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GTS Transportation Corporation (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by L.G. Dove, Jr Notice of Initial Disclosures (Badders, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Teimuraz G. Melkadze (McCollum, Warren) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew P. Connelly on behalf of GTS Transportation Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7851075. (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Stephenson on behalf of GTS Transportation Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7851042. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER governing proceedings. Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur by July 6, 2020. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 10:45 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 6/18/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) by GTS Transportation Corporation.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (Filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) by Teimuraz G. Melkadze.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (Filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by L.G. Dove, Jr.(ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Teimuraz G. Melkadze First Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D)(McCollum, Warren) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Teimuraz G. Melkadze from 258th Judicial District Court of Polk County, Texas, case number CIV32888. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7840092), filed by Teimuraz G. Melkadze. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D)(McCollum, Warren) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B Badders