This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/01/2021 at 11:07:08 (UTC).

DOUGLASS v. '47 BRAND, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 DOUGLASS filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against '47 BRAND, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur J. Schwab. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00491

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAIR DOUGLASS

Defendant

'47 BRAND, LLC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Abramowicz

Kevin W. Tucker

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Wilk

Christian Antkowiak

Other Attorneys

Marla N. Presley

 

Court Documents

#184

183 #2

Proposed Order

183 #1

Exhibit A. Consent Decree

#183

#181

#180

#178

#177

#176

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#184) Approved Consent Decree as to Defendant Amyris, Inc. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/25/21. (lck) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#183) CONSENT DECREE by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Consent Decree, #2 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#182) TEXT ORDER approving #181 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#181) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Douglass v. '47 Brand, LLC, Lead Case No. 2:20-cv-00491-AJS) by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#180) REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. David B. White, Mediator The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 11/4/2020. (White, David) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#179) ORDER approving #178 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Douglass v. JS Products, Inc. and Top Rank, Inc.; Member Case No. 2:20-cv-00525), filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 11/2/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#178) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Douglass v. JS Products, Inc. and Top Rank, Inc.; Member Case No. 2:20-cv-00525-AJS) by BLAIR DOUGLASS (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) Court Approval, Adoption and Entry of Consent Decree as to Defendants JS PRODUCTS, INC. and TOP RANK, INC. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/28/20. (lck) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) CONSENT DECREE by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 10/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Butcher on behalf of GORUCK HOLDINGS LLC. (Butcher, Joseph) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/28/20. (ms) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER Pursuant to this Courts ADR Policies and Procedures, counsel and the parties are encouraged, prior to the scheduled ICMC of 9/17/2020, to mediate this case before Arthur H. Stroyd, who has successfully mediated many similar cases to date. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/27/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING Initial Case Management set for 9/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/27/20. (lck) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of CONSOLIDATION: Civil Action Nos. 20-499, 20-500, 20-502, 20-508, 20-509, 20-510, 20-515, 20-516, 20-517, 20-521, 20-522, 20-525, 20-533, 20-534, 20-535, 20-543, 20-546, 20-547, 20-551 and 20-552 are hereby consolidated with Civil Action No. 20-491. All pleading, motions, and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at this case. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 4/27/20. (lck) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI) (Entered: 04/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. '47 BRAND, LLC waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Tucker, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to '47 BRAND, LLC (jjg) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against '47 BRAND, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5549767), filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jjg) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less