This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 10:52:48 (UTC).

Douglas v. Loomis Armored US, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Douglas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Loomis Armored US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00040

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tierra Douglas

Defendant

Loomis Armored US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Janney, III

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas B. Janney III

2021 Richard Jones Road, Suite 310A

Nashville, TN 37215

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Allen Rybacki

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. (Nashville)

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Loomis Armored US, LLC. (Rybacki, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Loomis Armored US, LLC.(Rybacki, Timothy) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Tierra Douglas. Loomis Armored US, LLC served on 2/11/2021. (Janney, Douglas) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 01/20/2021. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons issued as to Loomis Armored US, LLC. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/5/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Douglas B. Janney, III admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Loomis Armored US, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3296836), filed by Tierra Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOOMIS ARMORED US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas B. Janney, III