This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2020 at 09:45:41 (UTC).

Douglas v. Jimerson et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Douglas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jimerson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stella Douglas

Defendants

Marcus Jimerson

Amistad Freight Services Inc

Amistad Freight Inc

John Doe Entities

John Doe

John Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Beard, Jr.

Attorney at Rainwater, Holt & Sexton P.A.

Post Office Box 17250

Little Rock, AR 72222-7250

Defendant Attorneys

Taylor Norman Williams

Attorney at Watts, Donovan & Tilley, P.A.

200 River Market Avenue, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-1769

Richard N. Watts

Attorney at Watts, Donovan & Tilley, P.A.

200 River Market Avenue, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-1769

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party Amistad Freight Services, Inc. by Stella Douglas (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/9/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/23/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/1/20. (mmb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Amistad Freight Inc, Amistad Freight Services Inc, Marcus Jimerson.(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stella Douglas.(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amistad Freight Inc, Amistad Freight Services Inc, Marcus Jimerson from Cleburne County Circuit Court, case number 12CV-20-36. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076646. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Dismiss Party. Accordingly, Amistad Freight Services, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/29/20. (dmm) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party Amistad Freight Services, Inc. by Stella Douglas (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/9/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/23/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 4/1/20. (mmb) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Amistad Freight Inc, Amistad Freight Services Inc, Marcus Jimerson.(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stella Douglas.(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amistad Freight Inc, Amistad Freight Services Inc, Marcus Jimerson from Cleburne County Circuit Court, case number 12CV-20-36. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT076646. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Beard, Jr.