This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 08:06:41 (UTC).

Douglas v. Greenup County, Ky et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Douglas filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Greenup County, Ky. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Danny C. Reeves and P SO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

Referral Judge

P SO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles W. Douglas

Hopkinsville, KY 42240

Defendants

Belinda Moore

Kentucky Correctional Medical Health Care Service Network

Greenup County Jail

Richard Diamond

Mike Worthington

Greenup County, Ky

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT : 1) Plaintiff Charles W. Douglas's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/12/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Douglas via U.S. Mail (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) Douglas's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2) Any pending requests for relief are DENIED AS MOOT. 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/12/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Douglas via U.S. Mail (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER: 1. Douglas's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Section 1915(b)(1) requires a prisoner-plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee for a civil action as set forth below. 2. The financial documentation filed by Douglas indicates that he lacks sufficient income or assets to pay the initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), and payment of such fee therefore is DEFERRED. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Douglas's name for receipt of the filing fee; complete a EDKY 525; serve copy of this Order and the Form EDKY525 upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Douglas is currently confined and upon the Office of the General Counsel for the DOC, Frankfort, KY. 4. Each month, Douglas's custodian shall send the Clerk of Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund acct, but only if acct exceeds $10. The custodian shall continue such mthly pymts until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. Douglas's motion requesting to subpoena his medical records R #7 is DENIED. 6. Douglas's motion requesting to submit proof into evidence re medical equipment issued to him R. #8 is DENIED. 7. Douglas's motion requesting that the Court equitably toll the statute of limitations applicable to his claims R. #9 is DENIED. 8. Douglas's motion re a receipt from the inmate accts dept of the GCDC R. #10 is DENIED. 9. Douglas must immediately advise the Clerk's office of any change in his current mailing address Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 10. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/27/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Douglas (via US Mail) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION Return of funds by Charles W. Douglas, pro seMotions referred to P SO. Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

9 #2

Dept of Public Advocacy letter to Douglas

9 #1

"Complaint evidence" regarding law library access

#9

(#9) MOTION Access to law library by Charles W. Douglas, pro se.Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 "Complaint evidence" regarding law library access, #2 Dept of Public Advocacy letter to Douglas). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

8 #1

Medical equipment receipt

#8

(#8) MOTION Return of medical equipment by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Medical equipment receipt). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

7 #2

"Complaint evidence" regarding medical records requests

7 #1

"Complaint" regarding medical records

#7

(#7) MOTION medical records requests by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 "Complaint" regarding medical records, #2 "Complaint evidence" regarding medical records requests). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #2

env, pm 11-23-19

6 #1

inmate acct statement

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles W. Douglas Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 inmate acct statement, #2 env, pm 11-23-19)(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Detail Sheet)(JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

env, pm 11-1-19

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT 0 summons(es) presented referred to Judge, filed by Charles W. Douglas, pro se. (Attachments: #1 env, pm 11-1-19)(JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT : 1) Plaintiff Charles W. Douglas's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/12/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Douglas via U.S. Mail (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) Douglas's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. 2) Any pending requests for relief are DENIED AS MOOT. 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/12/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Douglas via U.S. Mail (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: 1. Douglas's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Section 1915(b)(1) requires a prisoner-plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee for a civil action as set forth below. 2. The financial documentation filed by Douglas indicates that he lacks sufficient income or assets to pay the initial partial filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), and payment of such fee therefore is DEFERRED. 3. The Clerk of Court shall open an account in Douglas's name for receipt of the filing fee; complete a EDKY 525; serve copy of this Order and the Form EDKY525 upon the Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Douglas is currently confined and upon the Office of the General Counsel for the DOC, Frankfort, KY. 4. Each month, Douglas's custodian shall send the Clerk of Court a payment in an amount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month out of his inmate trust fund acct, but only if acct exceeds $10. The custodian shall continue such mthly pymts until the entire $350 filing fee is paid. 5. Douglas's motion requesting to subpoena his medical records R #7 is DENIED. 6. Douglas's motion requesting to submit proof into evidence re medical equipment issued to him R. #8 is DENIED. 7. Douglas's motion requesting that the Court equitably toll the statute of limitations applicable to his claims R. #9 is DENIED. 8. Douglas's motion re a receipt from the inmate accts dept of the GCDC R. #10 is DENIED. 9. Douglas must immediately advise the Clerk's office of any change in his current mailing address Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 10. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/27/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Douglas (via US Mail) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION Return of medical equipment, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION medical records requests #9 MOTION Access to law library, #10 MOTION Return of funds by Charles W. Douglas, pro se. (JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION Return of funds by Charles W. Douglas, pro seMotions referred to P SO. Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION Access to law library by Charles W. Douglas, pro se.Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 "Complaint evidence" regarding law library access, #2 Dept of Public Advocacy letter to Douglas). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION Return of medical equipment by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Medical equipment receipt). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION medical records requests by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 "Complaint" regarding medical records, #2 "Complaint evidence" regarding medical records requests). Received in same envelope as #6 .(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles W. Douglas Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 inmate acct statement, #2 env, pm 11-23-19)(JLS) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: 1) the #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice; 2) the Clerk is directed to mark the assigned case number on (a) an affidavit of assets/In forma pauperis application; and (b) a Certificate of Inmate Account and send them to Douglas; 3) Should Douglas wish to pursue this action, he must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or: (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff; (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets and (3) file both documents with the Court; 4) Douglas must take these steps within thirty (30) days of his case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/14/19. (JLS)cc: COR, Douglas w/appropriate forms via USMail (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles W. Douglas (JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles W. Douglas, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Detail Sheet)(JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT 0 summons(es) presented referred to Judge, filed by Charles W. Douglas, pro se. (Attachments: #1 env, pm 11-1-19)(JLS) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less