This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 08:11:04 (UTC).

DOUBLE v. Berry

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 DOUBLE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Berry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARL IVAN DOUBLE

Respondent

Walter Berry

Not Classified By Court

Attorney General State of Georgia (Notice Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Matthew B. Crowder

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square Sw, Room 216-C

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CARL IVAN DOUBLE.(ca) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

*Restricted*

2 #2

Corrected IFP form

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARL IVAN DOUBLE. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

IFP Short Form

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARL IVAN DOUBLE. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court orders Respondent to answer in writing the allegations of the petition within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/3/2022. (maa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Walter Berry (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Crowder on behalf of Walter Berry (Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Crowder on behalf of Walter Berry (Crowder, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Walter Berry (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Walter Berry answer due 4/4/2022. (maa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court orders Respondent to answer in writing the allegations of the petition within sixty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 2/3/2022. (maa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Inmate Account Statement by CARL IVAN DOUBLE. (wwp) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARL IVAN DOUBLE. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(wwp) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance re #4 Order due by 2/11/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a complete IFP motion, with supporting documentation, within twenty-one days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Short Form.) (jlh) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CARL IVAN DOUBLE. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(ca) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2022: #2 Corrected IFP form) (ca). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CARL IVAN DOUBLE.(ca) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Blackwell Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith