This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2021 at 08:38:02 (UTC).

Doty et al v. Kroger Company, The

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 Doty filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kroger Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan J. Dlott and Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan J. Dlott

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elizabeth Shaw

Lenora Doty

Tracy Simpson

Defendants

Kroger Company, The

The Kroger Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle L Kranz

Attorney at Zoll & Kranz, LLC

6620 W. Central Avenue, Suite 100

Toledo, OH 43617

Terence Richard Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Rachele R. Byrd

750 B Street, Suite 1820

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

#12

#15

#3

#6

#10

#13

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland and Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/20/2021. The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 1:21-cv-146; 1:21-cv-174; 1:21-cv-198; 1:21-cv-226; 1:21-cv-240; 1:21-cv-279 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kl) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines re doc. #13 : The Kroger Company answer due 6/28/2021. (eh) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 1:21-cv-279, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 and 1:21-cv-240 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Lenora Doty, Elizabeth Shaw, Tracy Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Terence Richard Coates for Plaintiffs Lenora Doty, Elizabeth Shaw, Tracy Simpson (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that the cases and case numbers 1:21-cv-240, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/19/2021. (kh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachele R. Byrd as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/14/2021. (eh) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8263989) of Rachele R. Byrd by Plaintiffs Lenora Doty, Elizabeth Shaw, Tracy Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Kranz, Michelle) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Kroger Company on 4/7/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Kranz, Michelle) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black and Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/31/2021. The Judges agree that Case 1:21cv198 IS related to Cases 1:21cv146 and 1:21cv174. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 3/24/2021. Case reassigned to Judge Douglas R. Cole for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kroger Company, The ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8231569), filed by Tracy Simpson, Elizabeth Shaw, Lenora Doty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kranz, Michelle) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.