This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 09:54:10 (UTC).

DOTY et al v. ADT, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 DOTY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADT, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00139

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANA DOTY

Petitioner

ALARM.COM INCORPORATED

Defendants

ADT, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT SECURITY SERVICES, INC.

TELESFORO AVILES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Holle Rosinia

Petitioner Attorney

Ian Gill Thomas

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit Reflecting Parties' Conferral Correspondence

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Exhibit Underlying Court's Order

11 #11

Main Document

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

10 #2

Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Ramos

8 #4

Text of Proposed Order

8 #3

Declaration of Christopher Michael Brown

8 #2

Declaration of Nicholas H. Rosinia and Exhibits 1-5

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

8 #8

Main Document

1 #6

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support

1 #1

Main Document

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 Cross MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena filed by SHANA DOTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reflecting Parties' Conferral Correspondence)(Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Order Extending Discovery Period In Underlying Action by SHANA DOTY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Court's Order)(Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Motion for Order; emailed to ithomas@offitkurman.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Filing fee not paid. Please remit payment overnight., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Memorandum in opposition to re #3 Amended MOTION to Quash , #8 Cross MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena and Reply in Further Support of Motion to Quash filed by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anita Spieth, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Ramos, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Opposition and Reply by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Cross MOTION to Compel Compliance with Document Subpoena by SHANA DOTY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Nicholas H. Rosinia and Exhibits 1-5, #3 Declaration of Christopher Michael Brown, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Memorandum in opposition to re #3 Amended MOTION to Quash , #1 MOTION for Order Quashing Subpoena filed by SHANA DOTY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas H. Rosinia and Exhibits 1-5, #2 Declaration of Christopher Michael Brown, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #3 Amended MOTION to Quash , #1 MOTION for Order Quashing Subpoena Extending Briefing Deadlines by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED, SHANA DOTY. (Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Holle Rosinia on behalf of SHANA DOTY (Rosinia, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ERRATA by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED re #1 MOTION for Order Quashing Subpoena filed by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Amended MOTION to Quash by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Motion for Order; emailed to ithomas@offitkurman.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Filing fee for miscellaneous case not paid. Please remit filing fee payment via check or money order. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED (Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION for Order Quashing Subpoena by ALARM.COM INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Ian) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less