This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Dotson v. Dish Network L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 Dotson filed an Other lawsuit against Dish Network L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robbie Dotson

Defendant

Dish Network L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W. Douglas Adams

Attorney at W. Douglas Adams, Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 857

Brunswick, GA 31521-0857

Defendant Attorneys

Lucas Drayton Bradley

Attorney at Bouhan Falligant, LLP

One West Park Avenue, P.O. Box 2139

Savannah, GA 31402-2139

Laura E. Kogan

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

200 Public Sq., Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114-2375

David M. Krueger

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

200 Public Sq., Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114-2375

Eric Larson Zalud

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

200 Public Sq., Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114-2375

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Robbie Dotson. Responses due by 4/26/2019. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robbie Dotson. (Adams, W.) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ca). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#17

(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zalud, Eric) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#16

(#16) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dish Network L.L.C.. Amendment to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Amended Certificate of Service for Motion to Dismiss. (Bradley, Lucas) Modified on 4/2/2019 (ca). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Dish Network L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/12/2019. (Zalud, Eric) Modified on 3/29/2019 (ca). (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Douglas Adams on behalf of Robbie Dotson. (Adams, W.) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ca). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff has not been filed. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/13/2019. (ca) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/14/2019. (ca) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dish Network L.L.C. (Bradley, Lucas) Modified on 2/14/2019 (slt). (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to All Counsel re: Notice of Removal. A Notice of Appearance or a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is due no later than 10 days after the issuance of this notice. Compliance due by 2/24/2019. (slt) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of State Court

1 #2

Exhibit B - Return of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - Case Filings

#1

(#13) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff has not been filed. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/13/2019. (ca) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #19 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal. (ca) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Robbie Dotson. Responses due by 4/26/2019. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robbie Dotson. (Adams, W.) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ca). (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zalud, Eric) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dish Network L.L.C.. Amendment to #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Amended Certificate of Service for Motion to Dismiss. (Bradley, Lucas) Modified on 4/2/2019 (ca). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Oral Argument re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Dish Network L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/12/2019. (Zalud, Eric) Modified on 3/29/2019 (ca). (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Douglas Adams on behalf of Robbie Dotson. (Adams, W.) Modified on 3/6/2019 (ca). (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Appearance on behalf of Plaintiff has not been filed. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/13/2019. (ca) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Laura E. Kogan. Lucas D. Bradley has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 26, 2019. (edd) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Krueger. Lucas D. Bradley has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on February 26, 2019. (edd) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Laura E Kogan Receipt Number 113J-2546064, Fee Amount $200, by Dish Network L.L.C.. Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David M Krueger Receipt Number 113J-2546047, Fee Amount $200, by Dish Network L.L.C.. Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric Larson Zalud Receipt Number 113J-2546034, Fee Amount $200, by Dish Network L.L.C.. Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Dish Network L.L.C. Responses due by 3/4/2019. (Bradley, Lucas) Modified on 2/19/2019 (jlh). (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Dish Network L.L.C. answer due 2/20/2019. (slt) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/14/2019. (ca) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Bradley, Lucas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dish Network L.L.C. (Bradley, Lucas) Modified on 2/14/2019 (slt). (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to All Counsel re: Notice of Removal. A Notice of Appearance or a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is due no later than 10 days after the issuance of this notice. Compliance due by 2/24/2019. (slt) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dish Network L.L.C. from Glynn County Magistrate Court, case number 1804911. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113J-2541124) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less