This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:58:16 (UTC).

DOTSON v. BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 DOTSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS, ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00529

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judges

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELISSA ANN DOTSON

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL R SANDERS - PENSACOLA FL

3298 Summit Blvd, Ste 32

Pensacola, FL 32503

Defendant Attorneys

FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

COURTNEY MICHELLE KING

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

SARAH A LONG

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS on behalf of MELISSA ANN DOTSON (SANDERS, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv529-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#27

(#24) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

5 #6

Proposed Order

5 #5

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SANDERS on behalf of MELISSA ANN DOTSON (SANDERS, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-00963-MCR-GRJ. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER - For purposes of administrative efficiency and judicial economy the Court has established a separate case, In re Deepwater Horizon BELO Cases, Case No. 3:19cv963, which will serve as a "master" docket for the management of the BELO cases transferred to the Northern District of Florida from the Eastern District of Louisiana. All individual BELO cases will be linked to the master docket. Lists of all BELO cases pending in this district as of April 19, 2019 are attached as Exhibits A, B, and C. The Clerk is directed to add all plaintiff and defense counsel of record to the master docket. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/25/2019. (djb) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/17/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv529-MCR/GRJ. (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #19 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record. (sdw) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC identifying Corporate Parent BP p.l.c. for BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC.. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Statement by Melissa Ann Dotson Regarding Venue (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion filed by Melissa Ann Dotson re #5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing . (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for defendant's #5 motions to compel currently set for submission on February 20, 2019, is hereby CONTINUED to February 27, 2019, and oral argument on all of these motions will be conducted on FEBRUARY 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for all affected plaintiffs and defendant must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. regarding #5 MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials and to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7193234) filed by Melissa Ann Dotson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Melissa Ann Dotson(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/2/2019.] (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less