This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:26:20 (UTC).

Doster v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Doster filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Max O. Cogburn, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cedrick Bernard Doster

Salters, SC 29590

Respondent

USA

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER 2255 MOTION as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Response due by 10/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/3/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) Pro Se MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:17-cr-12 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by Cedrick Bernard Doster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER 2255 MOTION as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Response due by 10/2/2020. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/3/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pro Se MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:17-cr-12 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by Cedrick Bernard Doster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less