This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:28 (UTC).

Dossett v. First Advantage Background Services Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Dossett filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against First Advantage Background Services Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05497

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Dossett

Defendant

First Advantage Background Services Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E. Michelle Drake

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C. -MN

Suite 505, 43 Se Main Street

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Gary B. Andrews, Jr.

Attorney at Blake Andrews Law Firm, LLC

1831 Timothy Dr.

Atlanta, GA 30329

John G. Albanese

Attorney at Berger & Montague, P.C. -MN

Suite 505, 43 Se Main Street

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick Thomas Smith

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP-Atl

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Connor McGinnis Bateman

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP-Atl

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Esther Slater McDonald

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP-Atl

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL First Advantage Background Service Corp.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. Discovery ends on 6/25/2020.(Bateman, Connor) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

#10

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by First Advantage Background Services Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9153936). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Advantage Background Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent STG-Fairway U.S., LLC for First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) Modified on 1/7/2020 (smj). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Rule 23.1(B) Class Certification Deadline by James Dossett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, E.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #6 Application of John Gerard Albanese for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/29/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate the deadline to move for class certification established by Local Rule 23.1(B). For good cause shown, the deadline for Plaintiff to move for class certification is vacated. The parties shall propose a new deadline for Plaintiff to move for class certification in their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 01/29/2020. (drg) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Rule 23.1(B) Class Certification Deadline by James Dossett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, E.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL First Advantage Background Service Corp.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. Discovery ends on 6/25/2020.(Bateman, Connor) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of John Gerard Albanese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9279377).. Attorney John G. Albanese added appearing on behalf of James Dossett (pmb) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Admission of John Gerard Albanese Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9279377). with Brief In Support by James Dossett. (Attachments: #1 Albanese - Minnesota Letter of Good Standing, #2 Albanese - Illinois Letter of Good Standing)(Andrews, Gary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification of Docket Correction re #5 Standing Order, Standing Order signed by Judge Grimberg entered in error. This case is currently before the magistrate judge.(smj) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) Modified on 1/7/2020 (smj). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First Advantage Background Services Corp.'s Answer is now due on or before 1/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/09/2019. (drg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Advantage Background Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent STG-Fairway U.S., LLC for First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by First Advantage Background Services Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9153936). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.